Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Legend: * = The particular bill was introduced in the 70th Session
              **= The particular bill was introduced in the 69th Session

SR1  Adopts Standing Rules of Senate for 71st session of Legislature. (BDR R-1110)
 Introduced On: Feb 05, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus
 Most Recent History Action: Feb 06, 2001 - File No. 1.
SR2  Provides allowances for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-1113)
 Introduced On: Feb 05, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus
 Most Recent History Action: Feb 06, 2001 - File No. 2.
SR3  Provides for appointment of attachés. (BDR R-1114)
 Introduced On: Mar 05, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus
 Most Recent History Action: Feb 06, 2001 - File No. 3.
SR4  Provides for appointment of additional attachés. (BDR R-1506)
 Introduced On: Mar 22, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus
 Most Recent History Action: Mar 26, 2001 - File No. 31.
SR5  Inducts Archie Pozzi, Jr. into Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1341)
 Introduced On: Mar 29, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James Mathews McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Rawson Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Townsend Washington Wiener
 Most Recent History Action: Apr 02, 2001 - File No. 38.
SR6  Inducts George W. Cassidy into Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1340)
 Introduced On: Mar 29, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James Mathews McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Rawson Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Townsend Washington Wiener
 Most Recent History Action: Apr 02, 2001 - File No. 39.
SR7  Inducts Norman D. Glaser into Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1338)
 Introduced On: Apr 02, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James Mathews McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Rawson Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Townsend Washington Wiener
 Most Recent History Action: Apr 04, 2001 - File No. 42.
SR8  Inducts Henry A. Comins into Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1339)
 Introduced On: Apr 02, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James Mathews McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Rawson Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Townsend Washington Wiener
 Most Recent History Action: Apr 04, 2001 - File No. 43.
SR9  Inducts Janice L. Thomas as an honorary member of the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1205)
 Introduced On: Apr 04, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James Mathews McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Rawson Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Townsend Washington Wiener
 Most Recent History Action: Apr 09, 2001 - File No. 46.
SR10  Designates certain members of Senate as regular and alternate members of Legislative Commission. (BDR R-1572)
 Introduced On: Jun 01, 2001
 By: Raggio Titus
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 06, 2001 - File No. 123.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo