Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Legend: * = The particular bill was introduced in the 70th Session
              **= The particular bill was introduced in the 69th Session

SJR1  Expresses support of Nevada Legislature for amendment to Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to require identification, mapping and recognition of certain rights of way across land administered by Federal Government. (BDR R-1039)
 Introduced On: Feb 08, 2001
 By: Natural Resources
 Most Recent History Action: May 18, 2001 - File No. 87.
SJR2  Expresses opposition to designation of national monument by President of United States without obtaining approval of each state and local government in which national monument is located. (BDR R-723)
 Introduced On: Feb 15, 2001
 By: Natural Resources
 Most Recent History Action: May 11, 2001 - File No. 76.
SJR3  Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to provide that certain orders from courts which command or compel the state or its political subdivisions to levy or increase taxes are not binding unless approved by the legislature. (BDR C-28)
 Introduced On: Feb 15, 2001
 By: O'Connell
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR4  Urges Governor to designate alternative routes for transportation of nuclear waste to Yucca Mountain. (BDR R-1185)
 Introduced On: Feb 21, 2001
 By: O'Donnell Neal Jacobsen Rawson Amodei Care Carlton McGinness O'Connell Schneider Shaffer Washington Gustavson Beers Chowning Arberry Jr. Collins Marvel Parks
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR5  Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to authorize legislature to establish business court. (BDR C-254)
 Introduced On: Feb 22, 2001
 By: Judiciary
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR6  Provides notice of disapproval to Congress if Yucca Mountain is recommended as site for repository for spent nuclear fuel and high-level radioactive waste. (BDR R-1159)
 Introduced On: Mar 07, 2001
 By: Titus Wiener Schneider Mathews Carlton Amodei Care Coffin Jacobsen James McGinness O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Raggio Rawson Rhoads Shaffer Townsend Washington Perkins Buckley Gibbons Parks Bache Koivisto Leslie Anderson Angle Arberry Jr. Beers Berman Brower Brown Carpenter Cegavske Chowning Claborn Collins de Braga Dini, Jr. Giunchigliani Goldwater Gustavson Hettrick Humke Lee Manendo McClain Mortenson Neighbors Nolan Oceguera Ohrenschall Parnell Price Smith Von Tobel Williams
 Most Recent History Action: Mar 09, 2001 - File No. 17.
SJR7  Urges United States Department of State to approve establishment of Mexican Consulate in Las Vegas. (BDR R-1148)
 Introduced On: Mar 07, 2001
 By: Legislative Affairs and Operations
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 08, 2001 - File No. 125.
SJR8  Urges CANAMEX Corridor Coalition and Federal Highway Administration to consider alternative routes for certain segment of CANAMEX Trade Corridor. (BDR R-1245)
 Introduced On: Mar 14, 2001
 By: Porter Brown
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR9  Urges Congress to declare crash site near summit of Mount Charleston as "Silent Heroes of the Cold War National Monument." (BDR R-1229)
 Introduced On: Mar 15, 2001
 By: Rawson Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James Mathews McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Raggio Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Titus Townsend Washington Wiener Brown Anderson Angle Arberry Jr. Bache Beers Berman Brower Buckley Carpenter Cegavske Chowning Claborn Collins de Braga Dini, Jr. Freeman Gibbons Giunchigliani Goldwater Gustavson Hettrick Humke Koivisto Lee Leslie Manendo Marvel McClain Mortenson Neighbors Nolan Oceguera Ohrenschall Parks Parnell Perkins Price Smith Tiffany Von Tobel Williams
 Most Recent History Action: Mar 20, 2001 - File No. 24.
SJR10  Urges Congress to require implementation of certain safety precautions if Federal Government locates repository for storage of high-level radioactive waste and spent nuclear fuel in Nevada. (BDR R-1247)
 Introduced On: Mar 15, 2001
 By: Shaffer Amodei O'Donnell Washington
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR11  Urges Congress to direct appropriate federal agencies to prepare environmental impact statement relating to transportation of nuclear waste materials to Yucca Mountain. (BDR R-1244)
 Introduced On: Mar 15, 2001
 By: Porter Titus Washington Care O'Connell Rawson Amodei Coffin James McGinness Rhoads Shaffer Wiener Perkins
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR11*  Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to authorize abatement of property tax for certain owners of single-family residences (BDR C-1435)
 Introduced On: Jan 30, 2001
 By: O'Connell
 Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2001 - File No. 102.
SJR12  Urges Congress to require Bureau of Land Management of United States Department of the Interior and United States Environmental Protection Agency to take certain actions to prevent and reduce air pollution. (BDR R-792)
 Introduced On: Mar 26, 2001
 By: Natural Resources
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 04, 2001 - (No further action taken.)
SJR13  Expresses support for certain applications for capital grant funding from Federal Transit Administration and urges Nevada Congressional Delegation to pursue attainment of these grants. (BDR R-1522)
 Introduced On: May 02, 2001
 By: Transportation
 Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2001 - File No. 105.
SJR14  Urges Congress to dedicate Old Spanish Trail and Antonio Armijo Route of Old Spanish Trail as National Historic Trail. (BDR R-1504)
 Introduced On: May 03, 2001
 By: Titus Mathews Amodei Care Carlton Coffin Jacobsen James McGinness Neal O'Connell O'Donnell Porter Raggio Rawson Rhoads Schneider Shaffer Townsend Washington Wiener Manendo Anderson Angle Arberry Jr. Bache Beers Berman Brower Brown Buckley Carpenter Cegavske Chowning Claborn Collins de Braga Dini, Jr. Freeman Gibbons Giunchigliani Goldwater Gustavson Hettrick Humke Koivisto Lee Leslie Marvel McClain Mortenson Neighbors Nolan Oceguera Ohrenschall Parks Parnell Perkins Price Smith Tiffany Von Tobel Williams
 Most Recent History Action: May 07, 2001 - File No. 69.
SJR20*  Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to provide requirements for enactment of property and sales tax exemptions (BDR C-709)
 Introduced On: Jan 30, 2001
 By:
 Most Recent History Action: Jun 06, 2001 - (Replaced by Senate Joint Resolution No. 1 of the 17th Special Session of the Nevada Legislature.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo