Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

 

Bills Passed in the 71st Regular Session: Effective Past January 1, 2002

 

Bill

Title

Effective Date Statement

AB37

AN ACT relating to child support; increasing the presumptive maximum monthly amount that certain parents may be required to pay for support of a child; requiring the office of court administrator to adjust annually the amount of such payments based on the consumer price index; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on April 1, 2002, for the purpose of allowing the office of court administrator to adjust the presumptive maximum amount per month per child for an obligation for support pursuant to subsection 3 of NRS 125B.070, as amended by this act, and on July 1, 2002, for all other purposes.

AB60

AN ACT relating to meetings of public bodies; requiring a public body to post additional notice of its meetings on its website on the Internet if the public body maintains such a website; providing an exception; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on January 1, 2003.

AB325

AN ACT relating to property; revising the provisions concerning the rule against perpetuities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on December 1, 2002, only if Assembly Joint Resolution No. 4 of the 70th session of the Nevada Legislature is approved by the voters at the general election on
November 5, 2002.

AB338

AN ACT relating to workers’ compensation; requiring a hearing officer or appeals officer to order an insurer, organization for managed care, third-party administrator or employer to pay for treatment or other services provided to an employee by a provider of health care under certain circumstances; requiring an insurer to include in certain statements a notice setting forth the right of an injured employee to select an alternative treating physician or chiropractor; authorizing an injured employee to select an alternative treating physician or chiropractor under certain circumstances; requiring the administrator of the division of industrial relations of the department of business and industry to design a form notifying an injured employee of his right to select an alternative treating physician or chiropractor; requiring an insurer to deliver to a treating physician or chiropractor certain provisions relating to the evaluation of a permanent impairment under certain circumstances; revising the provisions governing eligibility for and duration of vocational rehabilitation services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on July 1, 2002.

AB417

AN ACT relating to evidence; expanding the circumstances under which expert testimony concerning the effects of domestic violence and evidence of domestic violence are admissible in a criminal proceeding; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on October 1, 2002.

AB656

AN ACT relating to the business tax; authorizing the annual payment of the tax under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on July 1, 2002.

SB74

AN ACT relating to residential facilities for groups; clarifying the provisions regarding regulation of such facilities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on July 1, 2003.

SB164

AN ACT relating to public securities; contingently authorizing the purchase of municipal and revenue securities by the state for the improvement, acquisition and construction of facilities for certain public schools; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on December 1, 2002, only if Assembly Joint Resolution No. 26 of the 70th session of the
Nevada Legislature is approved by the voters at the general election on November 5, 2002.

SB172

AN ACT relating to weapons; removing the limitation on the number of firearms for which a permit to carry concealed firearms may be issued; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on July 1, 2002.

SB245

AN ACT relating to professions; requiring interpreters for persons who are deaf or whose hearing is impaired to be certified; prescribing the requirements for certification; requiring the commission on professional standards in education to adopt regulations that require certain teachers and other educational personnel to satisfy the requirements for certification as an interpreter; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

1.  This section and sections 1 to 9, inclusive, and 27 to 30, inclusive, of this act become effective on July 1, 2003.
2.  Sections 10 to 26, inclusive, of this act become effective on July 1, 2005.

SB563

AN ACT relating to telecommunications; providing a procedure by which a customer may dispute a surcharge, fee or designation of place of primary use; changing the place of billing of the customers from which a supplier of mobile telephone service may collect certain fees; changing provisions relating to a limitation on fees charged by local government for a public utility that sells or resells wireless service; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

This act becomes effective on August 1, 2002.

 


Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo