Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB483
Introduced on Mar 19, 2001
By Beers, Tiffany, Berman, Brown, Carpenter, Collins, Hettrick, Humke, Lee, Marvel, Price
Makes various changes concerning reporting of campaign contributions and expenditures. (BDR 24-557)
Fiscal Note
   Effect On Local Government: Yes.
   Effect on the State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full bill history below)
(Replaced by A.B. 8 of the 17th Special Session of Nevada Legislature.)

Hearings
Assembly Elections, Procedures, and Ethics Apr-05-2001 No Action
Assembly Elections, Procedures, and Ethics Apr-10-2001 Do pass
Senate Government Affairs May-09-2001 No Action
Senate Government Affairs May-14-2001 Amend, and do pass as amended
Senate Government Affairs May-30-2001 Do not recede
 
Votes
Assembly Final Passage  Apr-27   40 Yea , 0 Nay , 2 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
Senate Final Passage  May-28   21 Yea , 0 Nay , 0 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced     1st Reprint         Second Reprint     Third Reprint     Fourth Reprint     Fifth Reprint        
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced     1st Reprint         Second Reprint     Third Reprint     Fourth Reprint     Fifth Reprint        
Amendments (HTML) Amend. No.596 Amend. No.645 Amend. No.769 Amend. No.1112 Amend. No.CA33

 Bill History

Mar 19, 2001

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, and Ethics. To printer.
  • Mar 20, 2001

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Apr 11, 2001

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Apr 13, 2001

  • Read second time.
  • Apr 17, 2001

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Apr 26, 2001

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 596). To printer.
  • Apr 27, 2001

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 645). To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2). To Senate.
  • Apr 30, 2001

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
  • May 23, 2001

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • May 24, 2001

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 769). To printer.
  • May 25, 2001

  • From printer. To re-engrossment.
  • Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • May 28, 2001

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1112). To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment.
  • Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None). To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • May 29, 2001

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 769, 1112 not concurred in.
  • To Senate.
  • May 30, 2001

  • In Senate.
  • May 31, 2001

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 769 and 1112 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • Jun 01, 2001

  • In Assembly.
  • Jun 02, 2001

  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
  • Jun 04, 2001

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment Nos. 769, 1112 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Jun 05, 2001

  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • Jun 11, 2001

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint.
  • To enrollment.
  • Jun 13, 2001

  • (Replaced by A.B. 8 of the 17th Special Session of Nevada Legislature.)

  • Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo