Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB503
Introduced on: May 31, 2003
By: Finance
Revises provisions governing homeschooled children and millennium scholarships. (BDR 34-1369)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 471.
     
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May-31-2003 12:35 PM Minutes    Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-01-2003 10:00 AM Minutes    Do pass
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May-31   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-01   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments (HTML)

Bill History

May 31, 2003

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 01, 2003

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6). To Senate.

Jun 02, 2003

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2003

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2003

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 11, 2003

  • Chapter 471.
Effective July 1, 2003.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo