Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB58
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Heck
Provides for the imposition of an administrative assessment for certain traffic violations in certain smaller counties to be used for the awarding of grants to volunteer organizations that provide emergency medical services. (BDR 14-221)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Feb. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar. 13, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Transportation     May. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     May. 17, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 20,   Nay 21,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 50

Bill History

Feb 01, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Feb 02, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 50.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 21, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 909.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 21, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 26, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo