AB380
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hambrick , Anderson , Carpenter , Dondero Loop , Horne , Manendo , Ohrenschall , Parnell

Makes various changes relating to the sexual exploitation of children. (BDR 15-727)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 160.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 12, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.407   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 407.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 160.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.