AB54
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 09, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes certain counties to establish programs to provide financial assistance to certain persons. (BDR 20-473)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 20, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 38,   Nay 3,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.465     Amend. No.660   

Bill History

Dec 09, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 11, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 465.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 660.) To printer.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 660 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.
  • Effective May 29, 2009.