Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

76th (2011) Session
Bill Draft Request List
06/23/11



Skip to: Search Requester/Subject: Terms

9 results were found for 'retirement'. Start Over

BDR   REQUESTER   DATE
23--317
AB67
Reno, City of
Limits application of provision which makes employer responsible to employee for impact of wages erroneously reported to public employees' retirement system.
8/31/2010
23--425
SB8
Personnel, Department of
Removes insurance premium payments and purchase of additional retirement credit as additional options to lump sum payment of sick leave payout for retired state employees.
9/01/2010
495 W Public Employees' Retirement System
Makes technical corrections to provisions governing the Public Employees' Retirement System, Legislators' Retirement System and Judicial Retirement System.
9/01/2010
23--638 Assemblyman Kirner
Revises provisions governing the Public Employees' Retirement System.
12/08/2010
23--955 W Governor
Revises provisions governing the Public Employees' Retirement System.
1/25/2011
S--964
AB405
Speaker of the Assembly
Revises provisions governing the Public Employees' Retirement System.
2/04/2011
Ch. 527
23--1028
AB477
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Revises provisions relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System.
2/11/2011
Ch. 181
1--1177
SB436
Budget and Planning, Division of-Administration
Revises provisions relating to the administration of the Judicial Retirement System.
2/25/2011
Ch. 263
S--1242
AB487
Administration, Department of
Makes an appropriation from the State General Fund to the State Board of Examiners for projected General Fund employee retirement buyouts and/or terminal leave payments for eliminated positions that result in the layoff of an employee.
2/25/2011
Ch. 464



Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo