Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

76th (2011) Session
Bill Draft Request List
06/23/11



Skip to: Search Requester/Subject: Terms

6 results were found for 'millennium'. Start Over

BDR   REQUESTER   DATE
34--334
SB107
Assemblyman Settelmeyer
Revises provisions governing the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program.
8/31/2010
34--586
SB96
Senator Hardy
Revises provisions governing eligibility for a millennium scholarship.
11/05/2010
Ch. 227
34--594
SB220
Senator Kieckhefer (Originally requested by Senator Raggio)
Revises provisions governing the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program.
11/15/2010
Ch. 19
34--747 Senator Kieckhefer
Revises provisions governing the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program.
12/14/2010
931 Senate Committee on Finance
Revises provisions relating to the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program.
12/15/2010
S--1238
SB486
Administration, Department of
Makes an appropriation to the Office of State Treasurer from the State General Fund for $10,000,000 to the Millennium Scholarship Program.
2/25/2011
Ch. 447



Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo