Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

76th (2011) Session
Conference Committees




  Name
Hearing Date
Hearing Time
Hearing Location
  Conference Committee on AB20
  Conference Committee on AB39 Jun 01, 2011 02: 30 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB40 May 31, 2011 03: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB59 Jun 05, 2011 04: 00 PM Room 1113B
  Conference Committee on AB77 Jun 05, 2011 04: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB136 Jun 04, 2011 03: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB199 Jun 06, 2011 02: 15 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB240 Jun 05, 2011 06: 30 PM Room 3133C
  Conference Committee on AB257 Jun 04, 2011 04: 00 PM Room 1113B
  Conference Committee on AB277 Jun 04, 2011 02: 00 PM Room 1113B
  Conference Committee on AB282 Jun 03, 2011 03: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB362 May 30, 2011 02: 30 PM Room 1113B (small conference room behind Assembly Sergeant At Arms)
  Conference Committee on AB376 Jun 06, 2011 08: 00 AM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB379
  Conference Committee on AB433 Jun 05, 2011 07: 15 PM Room 1113B
  Conference Committee on AB498 Jun 03, 2011 04: 30 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on AB524 Jun 06, 2011 09: 30 PM Room 1113B
  Conference Committee on AB525 Jun 06, 2011 03: 45 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on SB98 Jun 06, 2011 12: 00 PM Room 3143
  Conference Committee on SB99 Jun 06, 2011 02: 30 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on SB136 Jun 05, 2011 06: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on SB168
  Conference Committee on SB193 Jun 03, 2011 08: 30 AM Room 1113B
  Conference Committee on SB200 Jun 05, 2011 06: 30 PM Room 1219 - Sen. Wiener's Office
  Conference Committee on SB249 Jun 05, 2011 01: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on SB264 May 31, 2011 02: 00 PM Room 1113B (small conference room behind Assembly Sergeant At Arms)
  Conference Committee on SB268 Jun 05, 2011 03: 30 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on SB294 Jun 06, 2011 02: 00 PM Room 3161
  Conference Committee on SB365 Jun 05, 2011 10: 00 PM Room 3143
  Conference Committee on SB402 Jun 06, 2011 08: 00 AM Room 1219 - Sen. Wiener's Office







Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo