SB440
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Creates the Silver State Health Insurance Exchange. (BDR 57-1172)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 23, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 817     Amend. No. 896   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 07, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 817.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 896.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 896 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439.
  • Effective June 16, 2011, for the purpose of appointing voting members of the Board of Directors of the Silver State Health Insurance Exchange and July 1, 2011, for all other purposes.