AB6
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 13, 2010.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hambrick

Authorizes courts to allow certain victims of sex trafficking or involuntary servitude who have been convicted of engaging in or soliciting prostitution to have their judgments of conviction vacated. (BDR 14-366)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 06, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 10, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 444   

Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 444.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 65.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.