SB6
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: Judiciary

Authorizes the electronic reproduction of the seal of a court. (BDR 1-324)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 22, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 19, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 5   

Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 5.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.
  • Effective May 29, 2011.