AB138
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing pupils. (BDR 34-113)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 09, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Feb 21, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Mar 14, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 68     Amend. No. 620   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 08, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 68.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 620.) To printer.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 620 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
  • Effective July 1, 2011. Section 1 of this act expires by limitation on June 30, 2014.