Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

76th (2011) Session
Bills Effective January 1, 2013



This list contains those bills which take effect on January 1, 2013, either in part or as a whole.


AB74 Revises various provisions relating to the regulation of the insurance industry. (BDR 57-472)
  Sections 9.5, 51.9, and 132 of this act effective June 17, 2011. Sections 1 to 9, inclusive, 10 to 51.7, inclusive, 52 to 56, inclusive, and 58 to 131, inclusive, of this act effective: (a) June 17, 2011, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) October 1, 2011, for all other purposes. Section 57 of this act effective January 1, 2013. Sections 24 and 25 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational, and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. (Effective dates revised by Assembly Bill 499 [Chapter 553, Statutes of Nevada 2013].)

AB91 Enacts the Uniform Collaborative Law Act. (BDR 3-60)
  Effective January 1, 2013.

SB197 Revises provisions governing the system of governance and oversight of public education. (BDR 34-94)
  Sections 53.5 and 58.7 effective June 15, 2011. Sections 1 to 5, inclusive, 8 to 53, inclusive, 47.5, 54.5 to 57, inclusive, and 58.5 to 63, inclusive, effective July 1, 2011. Section 54 effective November 7, 2012. Section 6 effective January 1, 2012, for the purpose of filing for office and for nominating and electing members of the State Board of Education and January 8, 2013, for all other purposes. Sections 7 and 58 effective January 1, 2013.

SB226 Requires the Board of Wildlife Commissioners to adopt certain regulations governing the trapping of fur-bearing mammals in certain counties. (BDR 45-975)
  Effective June 3, 2011, for the purpose of adopting any regulations required by the amendatory provisions of this act, and January 1, 2013, for all other purposes.

SB271 Provides for withdrawal of the State of Nevada from the Tahoe Regional Planning Compact under certain circumstances. (BDR 22-988)
  Sections 17.3, 17.7, 22.5, 23 and 23.5 effective 06/17/2011. Section 22.5 expires by limitation on January 1, 2013. Section 1.5 effective upon proclamation by the Governor of this State of: (a) The enactment by the State of California of amendments that are substantially identical to the amendments to the Tahoe Regional Planning Compact contained in section 1.5; and (b) The approval of the amendments to the Tahoe Regional Planning Compact contained in section 1.5 pursuant to Public Law 96-551. Except as otherwise provided in subsection 5, sections 1, 2 to 22, inclusive, and 24 effective October 1, 2015, unless, by that date, all of the following events have occurred: (a) The State of California has enacted amendments that are substantially identical to the amendments to the Tahoe Regional Planning Compact contained in section 1.5; (b) the amendments to the Tahoe Regional Planning Compact contained in section 1.5 have been approved pursuant to Public Law 96-551; and (c) The governing board of the Tahoe Regional Planning Agency has adopted an update to the 1987 Regional Plan. In the event that the Governor of this State issues a proclamation pursuant to section 23.5, sections 1, 2 to 22, inclusive, and 24 effective October 1, 2017.

SB339 Establishes provisions relating to the safety of patients in certain medical facilities. (BDR 40-662)
  Effective June 10, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out this act, and for all other purposes: Sections 1 and 2.5 effective October 1, 2011; Sections 2 and 4 to 7, inclusive, effective January 1, 2012; Section 3 effective January 1, 2012, except that, for the purpose of the continuing education required by that section for infection control officers, effective January 1, 2013.




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo