AB504
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Taxation

Revises provisions governing delinquent taxes. (BDR 32-922)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 495.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 28, 2011     11:18 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Revenue     May 10, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     May 19, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 738   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.

May 27, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 28, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 738 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 495.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.