AB505
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Taxation

Revises provisions relating to governmental financial administration. (BDR 32-1147)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 28, 2011     11:18 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 313   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 313.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)