AB508
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions governing mopeds. (BDR 43-845)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 24, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 07, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 319   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 319.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 30, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 31, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)