AB519
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Makes various changes relating to the Office for Consumer Health Assistance. (BDR 18-1157)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 221.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 20, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 25, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 13, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 573   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 10, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 11, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 573.) To printer.

May 12, 2011

May 13, 2011

May 14, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 27, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 221.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.