AB522
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Authorizes the issuance of bonds for projects and programs to protect, preserve and obtain the benefits of the property and natural resources of this State. (BDR S-1211)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)