SB411
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Provides for the regulation of medication aides. (BDR 54-1104)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 212   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 212.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.
  • Effective June 4, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.