AB524
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Increases certain fees for residential and general appraisers to cover an increase in federal registry fees. (BDR 54-1199)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 466.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 27, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 803   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 803.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 803 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 803 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
  • To committee.
  • From committee: Recede from Senate Amendment No. 803.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

Jun 09, 2011

  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 466.
  • Effective January 1, 2012.