SB414
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Revises provisions relating to financial institutions. (BDR 55-1107)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 361.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 04, 2011     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 299     Amend. No. 716   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 299.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 716.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 716 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 361.
  • Effective June 13, 2011.