SB417
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Natural Resources

Provides for the placement of recycling containers in certain locations. (BDR 40-1108)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 13, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 28, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 19, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 28, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.
  • Effective June 4, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.