AB536
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to background checks for certain persons who work with children. (BDR 38-201)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 514.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 05, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 06, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 06, 2011     01:04 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 522   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 522.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 514.
  • Effective June 17, 2011, for the purpose of conducting investigations pursuant to section 25 of this act and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.