AB537
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing prohibited acts for certain health care practitioners. (BDR 54-1115)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 08, 2011     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 02, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 09, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 285   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 285.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 07, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 09, 2011

May 10, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 58.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.