AB538
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing the regulation of pawnbrokers. (BDR 54-1130)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 06, 2011     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 440   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 440.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.