AB542
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Provides for the licensing and operation of craft distilleries in Nevada. (BDR 52-649)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 08, 2011     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 439   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 439.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 04, 2011

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)