AB545
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Government Affairs

Makes changes to the population basis for the exercise of certain powers by local governments. (BDR 20-548)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 28, 2011     See Agenda          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Government Affairs     May 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 31,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 399     Amend. No. 750   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 399.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 750.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 30, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 750 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.