SB418
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Creates a subcommittee of the Legislative Committee on Health Care to oversee the implementation of federal health care reform in this State. (BDR 40-695)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

Jun 01, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Read second time.

Jun 03, 2011

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.