SB420
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes relating to the operation of certain facilities for long-term care. (BDR 40-158)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 238   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 238.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.