SB423
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Revises provisions concerning assistance to certain older persons and persons with physical disabilities. (BDR 38-1167)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 31, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     01:10 PM          Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-12-11   Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 05, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 04, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 05, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.