AB546
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Education

Makes various changes to provisions governing early childhood care and education. (BDR 38-739)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 28, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Apr 06, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 31,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 417     Amend. No. 829   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 829.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.