AB548
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing the system of governance of K-12 public education. (BDR 34-741)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 28, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Apr 11, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 13, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Jun 01, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)