SB426
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Makes various changes related to energy. (BDR 58-1156)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 20, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 818   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 818.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.