SB427
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Provides for the merger , movement and reorganization of certain state agencies .(BDR 18-1161)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 479.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 06, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 949     Amend. No. 978   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 949.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 06, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 978.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 978 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 479.
  • Sections 142 and 143 effective June 16, 2011. Sections 1 to 141, inclusive, and 143.5 to 147, inclusive, effective: (a) June 16, 2011, for the purpose of performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of those sections, including, without limitation, recruitment, selecting appointees, making appointments, and moving offices and equipment; and (b) October 1, 2011 for all other purposes.