SB431
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Authorizes the Secretary of State to make broader use of revenue from the enforcement of securities laws. (BDR 7-1155)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)