SB432
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing governmental financing. (BDR 32-538)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2011   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 812   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 06, 2011

  • Withdrawn from committee.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Government Affairs.
  • To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Amendment No. 700 withdrawn.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 812.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 812 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 504.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.