SB433
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Eliminates the position of Deputy Commissioner of the Nevada Transportation Authority. (BDR 58-1214)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr 22, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Apr 27, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)