SB434
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Makes various changes regarding funding and autonomy of Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 31-1175)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 15, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 07, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 06, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 868   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 868.) To printer.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • (No further action taken.)