SB441
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing the processing at self-service terminals or kiosks of certain transactions with the Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 43-1184)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 213.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 16, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

May 17, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 213.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.