SB449
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing tuition charges, registration fees and other fees assessed against students in the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-932)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Education     Apr 15, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 05, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 413     Amend. No. 870   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 413.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 870.) To printer.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.