SB451
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing tuition charges, registration fees and other fees assessed against students enrolled in institutions of the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-933)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Education     Apr 15, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 473   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 473.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)