SB468
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Makes various changes related to the Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 40-1221)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 13, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 04, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)