SB481
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Makes an appropriation to the Interim Finance Committee for allocation to the State Treasurer. (BDR S-1237)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 249.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 25, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 10, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

May 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 249.
  • Effective June 3, 2011.