SB485
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing the payment of certain expenses for the provision of care pursuant to the State Plan for Medicaid. (BDR 38-1196)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 446.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 01, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 14, 2011     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 06, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 446.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.