SB486
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Finance

Makes an appropriation to the Office of the State Treasurer for the Millennium Scholarship Program. (BDR S-1238)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 447.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 06, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 05, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 447.
  • Effective June 16, 2011.