SB488
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-1274)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)