SB492
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Revenue

Revises provisions regarding the payment of certain fees for mining claims. (BDR 46-734)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Waiver granted effective: 04/14/2011

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)